+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-136
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 792
- Senate Calendar Number 467
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6346
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 279
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 175
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/17
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 372 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 6, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 59 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor