+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/06
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding