+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-159
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 550
- File Number 786
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9750
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 216
- File Number 262
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR PURSUANT TO JOINT RULE 9
Type:
Primary Sponsor