+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-197
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 884
- Senate Calendar Number 674
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7537
- Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8103
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 8086
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8118
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C,D
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 88
- House Calendar Number 86
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 549 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 301 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 12
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 140
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (17)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor