+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-42
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7198
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7188
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7201
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7126
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,C
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 755
- Senate Calendar Number 520
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6144
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6374
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 6444
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 365
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 247
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Votes (7)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 311 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7201
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 3
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 313 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7198
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 314 PASS
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 310 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7126
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 312 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 7188
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 93 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 12
May 2, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 89 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (29)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor