+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 536
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 55
- House Calendar Number 78
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Sponsor
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor