+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 175
- House Calendar Number 138
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor