+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-172
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 706
- Senate Calendar Number 505
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6230
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Passed Temporarily
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 173
- House Calendar Number 136
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 498 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 77 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor