+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-75
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 501
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 154
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 143
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor