+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-195
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 636
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 455
- File Number 662
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 546 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 215
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (12)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor