+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-194
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 792
- Senate Calendar Number 567
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6162
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 294
- House Calendar Number 204
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 536 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 112 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6