+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 504
- House Calendar Number 321
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsors (3)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor