+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-30
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 684
- Senate Calendar Number 426
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8329
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 26
- House Calendar Number 56
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/09
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor