+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-138
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 754
- Senate Calendar Number 524
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6221
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 290
- House Calendar Number 200
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 451 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (15)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor