+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-192
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 791
- Senate Calendar Number 566
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6171
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 41
- House Calendar Number 69
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 554 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 118 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor