+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-170
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 845
- Senate Calendar Number 638
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7361
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 124
- House Calendar Number 106
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 489 PASS
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
May 21, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 228 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor