+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-169
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 623
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 527
- File Number 769
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 501 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 193
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (15)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor