+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-137
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 341
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 27
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 54
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 443 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 25
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor