+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-67
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 689
- Senate Calendar Number 441
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8427
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 573
- House Calendar Number 400
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor