+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-136
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 665
- File Number 862
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7552
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 286
- House Calendar Number 196
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 465 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor