+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment