+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 611
- House Calendar Number 365
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor