+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-25
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 705
- Senate Calendar Number 509
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5039
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5313
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 26
- House Calendar Number 52
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (30)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor