+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-40
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 790
- Senate Calendar Number 565
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6591
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 123
- House Calendar Number 105
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 330 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 119 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor