+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-107
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 538
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 294
- File Number 469
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Change of Reference to Labor and Public Employees
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor