+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-135
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 861
- Senate Calendar Number 655
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7548
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7600
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 284
- House Calendar Number 194
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 463 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 275 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 134
- Absent: 16