+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-208
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8616
- Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8559
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 597
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 44
- House Calendar Number 62
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/08
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor