+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 403
- House Calendar Number 261
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/09
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor