+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-65
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 500
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 52
- File Number 22
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor