+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 102
- House Calendar Number 99
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/15
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor