+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-38
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 338
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 77
- House Calendar Number 75
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/15
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 324 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 21
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (29)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor