+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-133
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 843
- Senate Calendar Number 637
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6006
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 460
- House Calendar Number 296
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 442 PASS
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 21, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 225 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (13)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor