+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-191
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 860
- Senate Calendar Number 660
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7573
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 629
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 417
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 570 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 255 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (30)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor