+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-37
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 704
- Senate Calendar Number 511
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6003
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 571
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 357
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 293 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 85 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (6)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor