+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor