+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-132
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 515
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 548
- House Calendar Number 344
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 450 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 79
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (31)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor