+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- No Action
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 53
- House Calendar Number 69
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/17 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
February 21, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor