+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-114
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 379
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 335
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 468
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor