+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 338
- House Calendar Number 216
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor