+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 477
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 69
- House Calendar Number 81
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
February 14, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
January 31, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor