+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-155
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Calendar Number 696
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10504
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 280
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 186
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor