+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 298
- House Calendar Number 230
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/02
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor