+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections