+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-161
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 801
- Senate Calendar Number 545
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7808
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 282
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 212
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2017: PS Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor