+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 601
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8671
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 281
- House Calendar Number 211
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
February 6, 2017: PH Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor