+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-190
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 685
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 237
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 358
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 551 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 310
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (34)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor