+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-24
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 510
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 266
- File Number 398
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 261 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 76
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (48)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor