+ − Actions (12)
On August 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On August 7, 2020 in the House:
- Public Act 20-4
On July 31, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor in Original
On July 28, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 3805
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3784
- Emergency Certification