+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference to Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health