+ − Actions (16)
On August 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On August 7, 2020 in the House:
- Public Act 20-3
On July 31, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor in Original
On July 28, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,D
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3838
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3839
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,D
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,D
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 3802
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 3783
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3777
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3767
- Emergency Certification